IPSWICH17 GOOD NEIGHBOUR SCHEME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROVIDE RELIEF TO THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, SOCIAL ISOLATION OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, BY MEANS OF PRACTICAL SERVICES, INFORMATION AND ADVICE AND SIGNPOSTING TO OTHER AGENCIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £2,000 from 1 government contract(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Suffolk
Governance
- 25 March 2020: CIO registration
- IP17GNS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Edward Roberts | Chair | 24 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Ann Newvell | Trustee | 05 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Wiliam Ewart | Trustee | 24 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.07k | £58.66k | £194.31k | £23.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.29k | £50.25k | £59.39k | £65.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.58k | £4.37k | £10.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
13 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Mar 2020
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THOSE PEOPLE IN SAXMUNDHAM AND KELSALE-CUM-CARLTON IN EAST SUFFOLK WHO ARE IN NEED, BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT, WITH PARTICULAR FOCUS ON PROVIDING ASSISTANCE TO THOSE AFFECTED BY CORONAVIRUS (COVID-19) IN THE IMMEDIATE FUTURE AND FOLLOWING ANY PANDEMIC
Contact information
- Address:
-
IP17GNS Saxmundham Town Council
The Gannon Rooms
12 Station Approach
SAXMUNDHAM
Suffolk
IP17 1BW
- Phone:
- 01728604595
- Email:
- secretary@ip17gns.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window