WELLINGBOROUGH SEA CADETS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Wellingborough Sea Cadets is a nautical theme charity under the umberella of the Sea Cadets. We take cadets from the age of 9 until 18 based off the customs of the Royal Navy in activities afloat alongside core building for that young person (DofE, BTECs)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 09 April 2020: Standard registration
- TS HYDRA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maria Kelly | Chair | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth O'Rouke | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Chandler | Trustee | 07 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Graham Lawman | Trustee | 07 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Birchall BSc | Trustee | 07 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.14k | £6.15k | £3.64k | £3.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.78k | £6.93k | £3.67k | £3.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 May 2024 | 109 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05 FEB 2020
Charitable objects
THE CHARITABLE PURPOSE OF THE UNIT (THE PURPOSE) IS TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL AND SOCIAL POTENTIAL AS INDIVIDUALS AND AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES USING A NAUTICAL THEME AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES, ETHOS AND PRACTICES OF THE MARINE SOCIETY & SEA CADETS (MSSC). IN FURTHERANCE OF THE PURPOSE, THE UNIT MAY: A. OFFER YOUNG PEOPLE A STRUCTURED ENVIRONMENT IN WHICH TO DEVELOP; B. PROVIDE ACCESS TO EDUCATION AND TRAINING INCLUDING (BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO): SAILING (INSHORE AND OFFSHORE), PADDLE SPORTS, POWER BOATING, SEAMANSHIP, NAVIGATION, MARINE ENGINEERING, COOKING, MUSIC, FIRST AID, DRILL, PIPING, AND PUBLIC SERVICE; C. PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE TO OBTAIN A RANGE OF QUALIFICATIONS; AND D. PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR COMMUNITY INVOLVEMENT. IN CARRYING OUT THE CHARITABLE PURPOSE, THE UNIT MUST KEEP IN MIND THE AIM AND VALUES OF THE SCC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wrenn School
London Road
Wellingborough
WELLINGBOROUGH
N8 2DQ
- Phone:
- 07960102754
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window