Trustees Pilling Village Hall
Charity number: 515897

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL MCWHIRTER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Evelyn Allen | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Curwen | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jason Worledge | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Arkwright | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Whiteside | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL O'LOUGHLIN | Trustee | 03 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Graham Curwen | Trustee | 05 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Savage | Trustee | 21 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
Beryl Richardson | Trustee | 20 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
KATRINA MARY BELL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.