WALTHAM FOREST MIGRANT ACTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We run a drop in service in Waltham Forest where migrants can come to socialize and can be given advice on immigration, welfare and housing issues, and any other help which they require and we can give.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 21 May 2020: CIO registration
- WFMA (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Ashan | Trustee | 19 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Caroline Valentine | Trustee | 29 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Rose Seacombe | Trustee | 27 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Luke Rooney | Trustee | 24 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Inbar Tamari | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jean Christine King MBE | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
CLIVE BOWER | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.71k | £32.81k | £44.01k | £51.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.12k | £26.98k | £25.44k | £38.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £760 | £3.24k | £765 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 21 May 2020 as amended on 17 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF OR PREVENTION OF POVERTY AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH AMONGST MIGRANTS, REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS WHO RESIDE OR WISH TO RESIDE IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF WALTHAM FOREST. (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF MIGRANTS, REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS WHO RESIDE OR WISH TO RESIDE IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF WALTHAM FOREST AND ARE IN NEED THEREOF SO AS TO ASSIST THEM TO ADAPT WITHIN A NEW COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
41 MILLFIELD AVENUE
LONDON
E17 5HH
- Phone:
- 07496394175
- Email:
- office@wfma.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window