Financial history THEATR NA N'OG-THEATRE OF ETERNAL YOUTH

Charity number: 515903
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £474.36k £444.45k £454.30k £616.02k £612.58k
Total expenditure £422.23k £444.52k £447.54k £582.22k £583.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £316.09k £319.57k £324.57k N/A £324.36k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £334.44k £324.44k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £269.89k £269.94k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £11.69k £16.18k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £2.03k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £540.87k £528.14k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £41.35k £54.98k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £78.50k £107.47k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0