KEIGHLEY CREATIVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote and advance the visual arts by exhibiting works of artistic excellence; and providing gallery, studio space and other facilities for the public Educate the public in arts and crafts in particular but not exclusively by the provision of a community arts centre, arts information hub, workshops, classes and arts festival Based in the old Sunwin House building in Keighley
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £132,806 from 8 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
77 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bradford City
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 21 July 2020: CIO registration
- KEIGHLEY CREATIVE SPACE CIC (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin O'Hare | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Kearton | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Buchan | Trustee | 23 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Rickards | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Sherburn | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charles Oxtoby | Trustee | 03 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bob Smith | Trustee | 03 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Webster | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.46k | £262.34k | £156.11k | £243.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.75k | £194.66k | £184.51k | £260.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £50.65k | £178.83k | N/A | £132.81k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 21 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO: 1) PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE VISUAL ARTS IN ALL THEIR FORMS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) EXHIBITING WORKS OF ARTISTIC EXCELLENCE; AND B) PROVIDING GALLERY AND STUDIO SPACE AND OTHER FACILITIES TO ENABLE THE PUBLIC TO ENGAGE WITH THE ARTS AND THE PUBLIC DISPLAY OF ARTWORK 2) ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND CRAFTS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF A COMMUNITY ARTS CENTRE, A COMMUNITY LIBRARY, WORKSHOPS, CLASSES AND ART SESSIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3-7 Cooke Lane
KEIGHLEY
West Yorkshire
BD21 3PF
- Phone:
- 01535 957980
- Email:
- admin@keighleycreative.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window