TRULL MEADOW TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Trull Meadow Trust owns and maintains approx. 6 acres of meadow in Somerset, adjacent to the Trull village allotments and Sherford Stream, for the benefit of informal recreation and relaxation by the public at large
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
Total income includes £15,526 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 09 July 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Francis Sawyer | Chair | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hilgrove Geoffrey Dolling | Trustee | 05 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Moore MA, AMA | Trustee | 08 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wing Commander Anthony James Kent | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joan Ann -known as Jo Wooldridge | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alan John Reeve C.A. | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.37k | £7.62k | £32.47k | £35.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £366 | £548 | £431 | £2.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | £15.53k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 06 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 06 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 08 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 08 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN LAND WITHIN TRULL MEADOW FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF TRULL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA FOR THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS NEEDING FACILITIES BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, AND FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE SOLE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SAID INHABITANTS. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE, TRULL MEADOW IS DEFINED AS THE AREA OF OPEN SPACE IN TRULL, TAUNTON, SOMERSET WHICH IS IDENTIFIED AS TRULL MEADOW ON PAGE 17 OF THE 'TRULL NEIGHBOURHOOD PLAN TO 2028.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
STABLE COTTAGE
TRULL ROAD
TAUNTON
SOMERSET
TA1 4QT
- Phone:
- 01823284082
- Email:
- trullmeadowtrust@gmail.com
- Website:
-
trullmeadow.wixsite.com/trullmeadowtrust
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window