TICKHILL COMMUNITY CONNECTIONS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our activities are based in Tickhill, Doncaster and include providing information , delivering shopping,prescriptions and activities to reduce feelings of isolation. We promote volunteering to support those in need in our local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Doncaster
Governance
- 04 June 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paula Margaret Rose Mickley | Chair | 14 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Hart | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Grace Colton | Trustee | 14 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Louise Rowland | Trustee | 14 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Yvonne Saunders | Trustee | 14 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.94k | £1.16k | £9.73k | £705 | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.65k | £2.31k | £7.87k | £1.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.33k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 April 2024 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 April 2024 | 76 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 February 2023 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 May 2022 | 95 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF THOSE WHO ARE SOCIALLY OR ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED IN TICKHILL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVISION OF PROVIDING CARE, SUPPORT, INFORMATION OR PRACTICAL ASSISTANT.
Area of benefit
TICKHILL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 HEATHER CLOSE
TICKHILL
DONCASTER
DN11 9UU
- Phone:
- 07956023514
- Email:
- tickhillhelp@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window