ENERGY SPARKS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Energy Sparks offers an online energy analysis tool and energy education programme specifically designed to help schools reduce their electricity and gas usage through the analysis of half hourly smart meter data. Energy Sparks provides advice and activities to support pupils and the wider school community to reduce their school's carbon footprint.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £25,200 from 1 government contract(s) and £240,962 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 29 April 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER ANDREWS | Chair | 20 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Edward Moore | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robert Richard Cohen | Trustee | 20 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Andrew Houston | Trustee | 15 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sunny Pawar | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tim Warnes | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Allen | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £221.27k | £422.06k | £464.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £161.75k | £290.32k | £499.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £26.41k | N/A | £25.20k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £146.96k | £240.96k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 14 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 14 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 25 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY DEVELOPING AND PROMOTING TOOLS, SERVICES AND PROGRAMMES TO REDUCE ENERGY AND RESOURCE CONSUMPTION AND CARBON EMISSIONS. (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY EDUCATING AND INFORMING THE PUBLIC, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY YOUNG PEOPLE ABOUT THE CAUSES AND IMPACTS OF CLIMATE CHANGE, AND THE IMPORTANCE OF ENERGY SAVING AND REDUCING CARBON EMISSIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FAIRLAWN
PARK CORNER
FRESHFORD
BATH
BA2 7UP
- Phone:
- 01225723924
- Email:
- hello@energysparks.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window