Financial history HUMBERSIDE YOUTH ASSOCIATION LIMITED

Charity number: 515919
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £732.26k £714.84k £713.40k £4.67k £3.00k
Total expenditure £751.92k £637.46k £698.05k £52.03k £11.59k
Income from government contracts £715.34k £668.78k £707.17k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £25.95k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £15.00k £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £715.34k £668.78k £707.17k N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £7.54k £5.11k £4.54k N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 £25.95k £1.68k N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £19.66k £10.39k £1.96k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £732.26k £627.07k £696.09k N/A N/A