Accounts and annual returns EXPANDING HORIZONS

Charity Number: 1192623
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 06 May 2024 25 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 06 May 2024 03 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 06 May 2023 25 February 2025 356 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 May 2023 03 March 2025 362 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 06 May 2022 25 February 2025 722 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 May 2022 03 March 2025 728 days late Download Open in new window