EGLISE EVANGELIQUE VIE NOUVELLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HOLDING REGULAR WORSHIP SERVICES IN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2022
Total income includes £8,750 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 14 April 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MAIMBENARY KONE | Chair | 10 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
GBAKA DIANA DOHOU | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
FANNY TANIA ALIMENTCHI | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
KONAN MONIQUE KOUAKOU | Trustee | 10 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.55k | £35.35k | £48.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.71k | £46.76k | £46.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £8.75k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 270 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 270 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 08 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 08 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 21 September 2022 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 21 September 2022 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 06 September 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 06 September 2021 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
77 - 79 RUSHEY GREEN
LONDON
SE6 4AF
- Phone:
- 07508002482
- Email:
- maimbenary@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window