PROMISED BEGINNING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of Promised Beginning (PB) is the advancement of education at all levels of young people in particular Ocala Village in Uganda and Kitunda in Tanzania as well as throughout both countries as trustees may from time to time think fit. Additionally, PB aim to work with others for the prevention or relief of poverty in particular Ocala village, Uganda and Kitunda village in Tanzania.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Tanzania
- Uganda
Governance
- 30 June 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Irene Akoli | Chair | 05 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Imelda Namujuzi Muhoja | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anita Maira Chilunda | Trustee | 02 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
FRED OLAM | Trustee | 02 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lillian Auma | Trustee | 05 February 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 09 April 2024 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 09 April 2024 | 64 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 26 February 2023 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 26 February 2023 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 14 February 2022 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 14 February 2022 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 30 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AT ALL LEVELS OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR OCALA VILLAGE IN UGANDA AND KITUNDA VILLAGE IN TANZANIA AS WELL AS THROUGHOUT BOTH COUNTRIES AS TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT INCLUDING BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY; (A) THROUGH THE PROVISION OF INDIVIDUAL GRANTS OR BURSARY; (B) SUPPORTING PARENTS TO ENGAGE MORE WITH THEIR CHILDREN’S EDUCATION. (2) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN PARTICULAR OCALA VILLAGE IN UGANDA AND KITUNDA VILLAGE IN TANZANIA AS WELL AS THROUGHOUT BOTH COUNTRIES AS TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT INCLUDING BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY; (A) THROUGH THE PROVISION OF BASIC SUPPLIES, (B) BY HELPING GAIN SAFE WATER AND SANITATION
Contact information
- Address:
-
92 NORTH DOWNS ROAD
NEW ADDINGTON
CROYDON
CR0 0LD
- Phone:
- 07746360624
- Email:
- pbeginning2019@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window