Accounts and annual returns THE HAPPINESS PROJECT GHANA

Charity number: 1190295
Charity reporting is overdue by 197 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 197 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 197 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 14 August 2024 288 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 14 August 2024 288 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 17 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 21 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window