THE HAPPINESS PROJECT GHANA

Charity Number: 1190295
Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Happiness Project Ghana's main activities are and the main focus is: 1. to provide an education to children in rural communities in Ghana 2. to help families to support themselves financially 3. to provide emergency medical care and medical insurance for all students 4. the implementation of a feeding program to feed each student every day 5. to give access to clean drinking water

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022

Total income: £13,000
Total expenditure: £17,000

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public. Works with a professional fundraiser with an agreement in place. It does not work with a commercial participator.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Ghana

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 July 2020: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • ALLIANCE FOR YOUTH DEVELOPMENT UK (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Shadee Faye Gerayesh-Nejad Chair 01 January 2019
None on record
Philip LLoyd Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Hannah Meyer Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £11.27k £13.00k
Total expenditure £3.96k £17.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 14 August 2024 288 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 14 August 2024 288 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 17 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 21 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
290
Andover Road
Newbury
290
Andover Road
RG20 0LL
Phone:
07929344753