WOOLFARDISWORTHY SPORTS AND COMMUNITY HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We run Woolfardisworthy Sports & Community Hall for the benefit of the local population, and are in the process of building affordable homes for local needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 01 May 2020: CIO registration
- 24 May 2022: Funds received from 1068125 WOOLFARDISWORTHY SPORTS AND COMMUNITY HALL
- WOOLSERY HALL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LYNFA ANNE TANNER | Chair | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Fairbairn | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tonia Ablett | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
JESSICA MILLS | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
PETER FOX | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
SARAH JANE MILLS | Trustee | 10 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
FAITH EVELYN BUTLER | Trustee | 12 May 2020 |
|
|||||
DEBORAH JANE KITE | Trustee | 12 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
YVONNE ROBERTSON | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
DESMOND THORPE | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
brian spinney butler | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
DEREK WALTER LOTT | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|||||
BARBARA STEVENS | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £198.35k | £131.48k | £62.66k | £56.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £136.75k | £152.30k | £29.70k | £44.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £24.14k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 24 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 24 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 May 2020
Charitable objects
A) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS. B) TO PROMOTE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY THE PROVISION OF CHARITABLE SOCIAL HOUSING AND ASSOCIATED FACILITIES, SERVICES AND AMENITIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
WOOLSERY SPORTS & COMMUNITY HALL
MEADOW COURT
WOOLSERY
BIDEFORD
EX39 5EY
- Phone:
- 01237451627
- Email:
- woolseryhall@gmail.com
- Website:
-
woolsery.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window