TIBA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education/training religious sessions
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 08 September 2020: Standard registration
- ALKAFEEL FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DEALDEN DIAA ALZUBAIDI | Chair | 28 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARYAM DEALDEN ZUBAIDI | Trustee | 28 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr ALI MAKI | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.75k | £7.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.52k | £10.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 252 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 252 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 20 November 2023 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 01 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 JUL 2020 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28 AUG 2020 as amended on 24 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
1.FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAM RELIGION IN HARROW AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE PROVISION OF PREACHING THE TEACHINGS OF THE ÔQURANÖ THE HOLY BOOK AND RAISING AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF RELIGIOUS BELIEFS. 2.FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN HARROW AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO PROVIDING ARABIC LANGUAGE TEACHINGS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Mountington Park Close
HARROW
Middlesex
HA3 0NW
- Phone:
- 07871203038
- Email:
- tiba.foundation.1@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window