URBAN GENERATION TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Working towards a culture of social justice and financial equity for all, by addressing the disparities caused by poverty and discrimination. Objectives: Education: Deliver programmes that improve financial literacy for under-served communities. Entrepreneurship: Provide work experience & mentoring to develop enterprise & career progression. Research: Barriers to generational wealth.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 19 October 2020: Standard registration
- 19 June 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £550 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07 NOV 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02 OCT 2020
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (‘OBJECTS’) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY THROUGH UNDERTAKING AND SUPPORTING DEVELOPMENT OF ENTREPRENEURSHIP AND FINANCIAL LITERACY OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL (AND PARTICULARLY AMONGST THE MOST DISADVANTAGED) TO MITIGATE THE FACTORS THAT CONTRIBUTE TO POVERTY. TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY THROUGH UNDERTAKING AND SUPPORTING RESEARCH INTO FACTORS THAT CONTRIBUTE TO POVERTY AND THE MOST APPROPRIATE WAYS TO MITIGATE THESE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window