CROYDON FOODBANK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide relief of financial hardship amongst people of Croydon and the surrounding area in particular, but not exclusively by providing emergency food, essential toiletries, house items to individual and families in need and/for the distribution by charities or other organisations working to prevent or relieve poverty among others.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 08 July 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY PHILLIPS | Trustee | 08 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Rev Richard Ayetey | Trustee | 08 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kwabena Samuel Ackah | Trustee | 08 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £120.80k | £13.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.41k | £52.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 94 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 94 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 460 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 460 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 February 2023 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 February 2023 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 June 2022 | 148 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 June 2022 | 148 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 08 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST PEOPLE IN CROYDON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: A) PROVIDING EMERGENCY FOOD, ESSENTIAL TOILETRIES, AND HOUSEHOLD ITEMS TO INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES IN NEED AND/OR FOR DISTRIBUTION BY CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. B) SUCH OTHER MEANS, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT OR SIGNPOSTING TO RELEVANT INFORMATION AND OTHER ADVISORY SERVICES.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIT 5
46 PILTON ESTATE
PITLAKE
CROYDON
CR0 3RA
- Phone:
- 02086865664
- Email:
- croydonfoodbank@mail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.