Accounts and annual returns THE ST MARY'S PARISH CLEATOR HANDMAIDENS AND BRANCARDIERS SOCIETY

Charity number: 515938
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 27 February 2006 14 November 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 27 February 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2005 13 September 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not Required
Annual return 26 March 2004 27 July 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 26 March 2004 Not Required