THE ST MARY'S PARISH CLEATOR HANDMAIDENS AND BRANCARDIERS SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 27 February 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Cumbria
Governance
- 19 December 1984: Standard registration
- 19 September 2007: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CLEATOR MOOR LOURDES SICK FUND (Working name)
- CLEATOR PARISH LOURDES SICK FUND (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 26/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 27/02/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.10k | £3.93k | £38.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.10k | £5.01k | £6.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 27 February 2006 | 14 November 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 February 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 13 September 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 26 March 2004 | 27 July 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 March 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 29 NOVEMBER 1984
Charitable objects
PROMOTING THE PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL WELFARE OF ANY AGED, SICK OR HANDICAPPED PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE ROMAN CATHOLIC PARISH OF ST. MARY'S CLEATOR AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY PROVIDING FUNDS AND SUITABLE ASSISTANCE SO AS TO ENABLE THEM TO TAKE PART AND GO UPON PILGRIMAGES TO LOURDES.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window