WOODLANDS ANIMAL SANCTUARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity's purpose is to relieve the suffering of animals, in particular cats, hedgehogs, guinea pigs, hamsters, birds, goats, sheep, ponies, donkeys and horses in the Northwest of England and to provide or maintain refuge, secure homes, sanctuaries or other facilities for the reception and care of unwanted domestic animals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Knowsley
- Lancashire
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
Governance
- 14 August 2020: CIO registration
- 02 March 2022: Funds received from 1108626 WOODLANDS ANIMAL SANCTUARY
- WOODLANDS ANIMAL SANCTUARY (HOLMESWOOD) LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria McDerby | Chair | 27 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Neil Hailwood | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Graham Tindall | Trustee | 20 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Denise Wareham | Trustee | 31 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Simpson | Trustee | 07 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alison Jane Speakman PhD | Trustee | 27 June 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 13/08/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £397.38k | £175.94k | £201.92k | £314.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £146.20k | £156.55k | £255.72k | £305.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 13 August 2021 | 03 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 August 2021 | 03 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS, IN PARTICULAR CATS, HEDGEHOGS, GUINEA PIGS, HAMSTERS, BIRDS, GOATS, SHEEP, PONIES, DONKEYS AND HORSES WHO ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION, AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE OR MAINTAIN REFUGE, SECURE HOMES, SANCTUARIES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION AND CARE OF UNWANTED DOMESTIC ANIMALS AND THE TREATMENT OF SICK OR ILL-TREATED DOMESTIC ANIMALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WOODLANDS FARM
SANDY LANE
HOLMESWOOD
ORMSKIRK
L40 1UE
- Phone:
- 01704823293
- Email:
- info@animalsanctuary.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window