CARDIFF DOGS HOME, THE RESCUE HOTEL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote humane behaviour towards dogs in Cardiff and the Vale of Glamorgan through the provision of funding, items, services and support to assist Cardiff Dogs Home in its work. To advance the education of the public in matters pertaining to responsible dog ownership and the prevention of cruelty and suffering among dogs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cardiff
- Merthyr Tydfil
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
- Vale Of Glamorgan
Governance
- 15 April 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hayley Marie Perkins | Trustee | 08 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Bernard Plain | Trustee | 08 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Jane Acreman | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mathew John Acreman | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Milakovic | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £162.80k | £164.40k | £260.33k | £360.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.07k | £67.38k | £85.31k | £158.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Apr 2020 as amended on 31 Aug 2023 as amended on 21 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS DOGS IN CARDIFF AND THE VALE OF GLAMORGAN THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FUNDING, ITEMS, SERVICES AND SUPPORT TO ASSIST CARDIFF DOGS HOME IN ITS WORK TO PROVIDE APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR DOGS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO REHOME SUCH DOGS. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO RESPONSIBLE DOG OWNERSHIP AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG DOGS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE RESCUE HOTEL
C/O CARDIFF DOGS HOME
WEST POINT INDUSTRIAL ESTATE
PENARTH ROAD
CARDIFF
CF11 8JQ
- Phone:
- 02920711243
- Email:
- hello@therescuehotel.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window