HEADROOM - YOUNG PEOPLE'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide Specialist Youth Counselling, Anger management counselling and therapeutic group services to young people aged 11- 25yrs. Specialists in supporting those young people with some form of neuro-diversity inc ASC & ADHD Provide Specialist parenting support to the parents and carers of young people in this specific age group dealing with the challenges of emotional and behavioural regulation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
- Surrey
Governance
- 12 August 2020: CIO registration
- HEADSPACE YOUNG PEOPLE'S CHARITY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gemma Procter | Trustee | 25 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nichola Clark | Trustee | 25 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jeff Fisher | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Potter | Trustee | 17 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Callum Bowdrey-Roberts | Trustee | 24 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Reilly | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Mahony | Trustee | 28 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/07/2021 | 30/07/2022 | 30/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.83k | £61.02k | £55.42k | £88.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.09k | £39.32k | £55.66k | £80.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £7.50k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.00k | £6.96k | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 July 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 July 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 July 2021 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 July 2021 | 07 June 2022 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL DISTRESS OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN RUSHMOOR AND SURROUNDING AREAS SUFFERING FROM POOR MENTAL HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT FOR SUCH PERSONS. TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE BETWEEN 11 AND 25, AND THEIR PARENTS AND/OR CARERS LIVING IN NE HAMPSHIRE AND SURREY BORDERS AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS BY PROVIDING SUPPORT IN THE FORM OF COUNSELLING AND PARENTING ADVICE AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR EMOTIONAL RESILIENCE, CAPACITIES, CAPABILITIES AND ASPIRATIONS TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) PROVIDING PARENTING EDUCATION BY PROVIDING BESPOKE 121 SUPPORT TO PROMOTE POSITIVE PARENTING AND FAMILY STABILITY; (C) RELIEVING POOR MENTAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Headroom Young People's Charity
Suite 1 Wesley Hall
Barrack Road
Aldershot
Hants
GU11 3NP
- Phone:
- 07464507974
- Email:
- INFO@HEADROOMCHARITY.CO.UK
- Website:
-
WWW.HEADROOMCHARITY.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window