MELANIN MEDICS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Mentoring young people who are interested in studying Medicine at University Providing educational events, resources and programmes to aid career development Conducting school outreach session to widen aspirations of young people from deprived backgrounds Promoting diversity in Medicine through workshops
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 April 2020: CIO registration
- 22 January 2025: Funds received from 1195137 PATHWAY TO MED
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Anthea Rebecca Davy | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ifeoluwa Akano-Williams | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Khadija Owusu | Trustee | 09 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr Nadia Ibrahim | Trustee | 09 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr Olamide Oguntimehin | Trustee | 09 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.52k | £27.48k | £41.99k | £30.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.36k | £12.41k | £28.85k | £35.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED ON 09 APRIL 2020 AMENDED TO CIO FOUNDATION 16 JUL 2020
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY WITHIN HEALTHCARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: (A) THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE, GENDER, DISABILITY , SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR RELIGION; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; (C) PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS; (D) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Arundel House
66-80 Arundel Road
Unit 5-6
Luton
LU4 8DY
- Phone:
- 07411419467
- Email:
- info@melaninmedics.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window