NANN-K TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a charity that supports work to end the impact of desertification in the Sahel Region of Africa. We support the sustainable use of natural resources including renewable energy and low impact farming. We help local communities restore their land including through planting trees and natural regeneration.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Senegal
Governance
- 27 October 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Suzette Nadja Newman | Chair | 06 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janina Julia Kowalska | Trustee | 02 February 2021 |
|
|||||
JOHN BERNARD SAUVEN | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £85.84k | £108.14k | £98.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £58.12k | £63.47k | £118.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 June 2022 | 121 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 AUG 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20 OCT 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 2.1 TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND PRESERVE, CONSERVE, PROTECT AND IMPROVE THE ENVIRONMENT BY (WITHOUT LIMITATION): (A) AMELIORATING THE EFFECTS OF DESERTIFICATION IN THE SAHEL REGION OF AFRICA PRIMARILY FOCUSSING ON (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) SENEGAL; (B) PROMOTING THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES; (C) RELIEVING POVERTY AND IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES; AND (D) PROMOTING SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION. SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT MEANS “DEVELOPMENT WHICH MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS. 2.2 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUBJECTS RELATING TO DESERTIFICATION AND MORE BROADLY SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT AND THE PROTECTION, ENHANCEMENT AND REHABILITATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT; AND 2.3 SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hartley Fowler LLP
Tuition House
27-37 St. Georges Road
LONDON
SW19 4EU
- Phone:
- 02089461212
- Email:
- info@nann-k-trust.org
- Website:
-
nann-k-trust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window