THE FOX PROJECT (SOUTHERN WILDLIFE AMBULANCE NETWORK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Wildlife Ambulance Service deals with sick and injured foxes and abandoned fox cubs, including rehabilitation and releasing. The Wildlife Information Bureau regularly advises national and local government and members of the public. Our Fox Deterrence Consultancy provides Do-it-Yourself information on simple, humane and non-lethal methods of resolving conflict with urban foxes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bexley
- Bromley
- Croydon
- East Sussex
- Greenwich
- Kent
- Lewisham
- Surrey
- West Sussex
Governance
- 23 June 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr PHILIP JOHN ANSCOMBE | Chair | 01 April 2005 |
|
|||||
Angela Christou | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE LUCY WEBSTER | Trustee | 07 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Mary Wetton | Trustee | 08 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £793.51k | £487.35k | £448.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £311.54k | £427.79k | £560.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £772.31k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £18.41k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £121 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £2.67k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £377.03k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £299.42k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £3.23k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £8.90k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION OF HUMANE MENTODS OF CONTROL OF FOXES AND OTHER WILD ANIMALS. 2) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION OF THE BEHAVIOUR AND ECOLOGY OF FOXES AND OTHER WILD ANIMALS. 3) TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS AND BIRDS OF ANY SPECIES WHO ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE OR MAINTAIN REFUGES OR HOSPITALS OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE COLLECTION, RECEPTION, CARE AND REHABILITATION OF SICK OR ILL-TREATED ANIMALS OR BIRDS UNTIL THEIR EVENTUAL RELEASE BACK INTO THE WILD OR OTHERWISE THEIR TRANSFER TO AN ANIMAL SANCTUARY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE LODGE
KINGS TOLL ROAD
PEMBURY
TUNBRIDGE WELLS
TN2 4BE
- Phone:
- 01892824111
- Email:
- fox@foxproject.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window