NEWCASTLE FRONTRUNNERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Newcastle Frontrunners is a running club catering to the north-east of England, and based in Newcastle upon Tyne. We are part of the International Frontrunners network, a family of running clubs which are inclusive and welcome all sections of the community. We aim to reduce homophobia and improve Lesbian, Gay, Bisexual and Transgender (LGBT plus) communities participation in sport and running.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 August 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 12 May 2020: CIO registration
- 17 December 2020: Funds received from 1146403 NEWCASTLE FRONTRUNNERS
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paddy Price | Chair | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Chadwick | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Boggie | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Biggin | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stella Postlethwaite | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adam Moxley | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Grace Lewis | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Nevins | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Steven MacDonald | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Morrissey | Trustee | 11 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/08/2021 | 30/08/2022 | 30/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.02k | £18.28k | £17.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.04k | £19.08k | £21.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 August 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 August 2022 | 11 July 2023 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2022 | 11 July 2023 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 August 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2021 | 10 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 12 May 2020
Charitable objects
1.THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN NORTHEAST ENGLAND BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RUNNING AND ATHLETICS, BY PROMOTING AND ENCOURAGING PARTICIPATION, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THOSE WHO IDENTIFY AS LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL, TRANS, AND OTHER SEXUAL AND GENDER MINORITIES (LGBT+). 2.THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY BY THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION AND HOMOPHOBIA IN SPORT AND TO ENCOURAGE LGBT+ INVOLVEMENT IN THE LOCAL AND SPORTING COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/o Gosforth Leisure Centre
REGENT FARM ROAD
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE3 3HD
- Phone:
- 07940922174
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window