KNARESBOROUGH ROTARY CLUB WAUGH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of charitable donations and sponsorship and service to the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 04 June 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Deborah Anne Wilson | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Jayne Blevins | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Dixon Weddall | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Charles Ibbotson | Trustee | 20 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Helen Theresa Westmancoat | Trustee | 04 June 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.41m | £1.59k | £40.25k | £126.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.39k | £23.76k | £76.41k | £44.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.28m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £127.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £1.28m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £31.39k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £9.31k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £21.96k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 23 November 2024 | 207 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 23 November 2024 | 207 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 30 May 2022 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 31 May 2022 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 Jun 2020
Charitable objects
TO APPLY BOTH THE INCOME AND CAPITAL THEREOF TO OR FOR THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY OR TO OR FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE, INSTITUTION, SOCIETY OR OBJECT AS THE CLUB SHALL IN DULY CONSTITUTED MEETING FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WHARFEDALE
ARKENDALE ROAD
STAVELEY
KNARESBOROUGH
HG5 9JX
- Phone:
- 01423340775
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window