MID GLAMORGAN AREA SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity Number: 515965
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE PURPOSE OF SCOUTING IS TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS, AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024

Total income: £136,515
Total expenditure: £134,921

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Bridgend
  • Caerphilly
  • Merthyr Tydfil
  • Rhondda Cynon Taff

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 January 1985: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • MID GLAMORGAN COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Paying staff
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Susan Bailey Chair 25 September 2021
2ND BRIDGEND (BRACKLA) SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
BRIDGEND DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity reporting is overdue by 1214 days
Philip James Hubbard Trustee 29 September 2023
BRYNAWEL HOUSE ALCOHOL AND DRUG REHABILITATION CENTRE LTD
Received: On time
CARE AFTER COMBAT
Received: On time
Cerys Nicholas Trustee 29 September 2023
None on record
Ken Long Trustee 28 September 2023
None on record
Symon Dunstan Trustee 23 September 2022
None on record
Ian Price Trustee 12 November 2021
ST JOHN'S HOUSE TRUST (BRIDGEND)
Received: On time
RONALD JAMES DAVIES Trustee 27 August 2012
None on record
KEN HINTON Trustee 31 January 2012
ST JOHN'S HOUSE TRUST (BRIDGEND)
Received: On time
JOHN CHARLES TD, DL Trustee 06 December 2011
MOTIVATION AND LEARNING TRUST
Received: 1 day late
ROYAL MONMOUTHSHIRE ROYAL ENGINEERS (MILITIA) REGIMENTAL MUSEUM
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £85.09k £46.15k £101.01k £126.89k £136.51k
Total expenditure £80.85k £34.03k £125.11k £132.42k £134.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £36.92k £10.93k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 31 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 31 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 10 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 10 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 08 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 08 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 25 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 25 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Miskin Mill Scout Village
Miskin
PONTYCLUN
CF72 8JJ
Phone:
01443223178