Accounts and annual returns ALL SAINTS YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity Number: 515967
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 24 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 28 May 2024 118 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required