THE HEXHAM AND DISTRICT BEEKEEPERS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education and advice. Advice given to the general public and to novice beekeepers. Education on honey bees and honey bee health provided to beekeepers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northumberland
Governance
- 07 January 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN Robinson | Trustee | 13 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
JANE MARGARET HUGHES | Trustee | 13 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH STEWART | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.65k | £11.10k | £9.72k | £11.07k | £10.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.70k | £7.42k | £16.30k | £9.24k | £9.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 23 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 11 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 NOVEMBER 1984
Charitable objects
THE ENCOURAGEMENT, IMPROVEMENT AND ADVANCEMENT OF BEEKEEPING IN HEXHAM AND DISTRICT.
Area of benefit
HEXHAM AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cross House
Allendale
Hexham
NE47 9EL
- Phone:
- 01434618446
- Website:
-
hexhambeekeepers.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window