ST MARY & ST PHILOPATER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS AND PRACTICES OF THE COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH AND IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT IN BOLTON, BURY, BLACK BURN, OLDHAM, ROCHDALE, WIGAN, ALTRINCHAM AND PRESTON. Activities: Worship and Pastoral Care, Christmas Choir , Holy Week Services, Sunday School, Help Poor & Needy and Other Social Activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 15 May 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Father Hedra Moawwad Gerges | Chair | 18 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
DR MAGDY AYAD HANNA NASRALLA | Trustee | 18 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Adel Fadel S Girgis | Trustee | 18 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
DR HELMY FAKHRY GIRGES | Trustee | 18 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
MATIAS MAXIMOS TAMASIH SLABA | Trustee | 18 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ossama Samir F Estifanous | Trustee | 18 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Matta Ibrahim Timsah Elbakouh | Trustee | 18 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £238.83k | £66.84k | £63.35k | £62.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £214.62k | £47.44k | £89.07k | £63.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £20.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18 JAN 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS AND PRACTICES OF THE COPTIC ORTHODOX CHURCH AND IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Mary & St Philopater Church
Montserrat Road
Bolton
BL1 5TX
BL1 5TX
- Phone:
- 07505889042
- Email:
- hedra.gerges@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window