SERV SUFFOLK & CAMBRIDGESHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A TRANSPORTATION SERVICE TO TRANSPORT BLOOD, VACCINES, HUMAN MILK, SAMPLES AND OTHER ITEMS USED FOR THE MEDICAL OR SURGICAL TREATMENT OF PATIENTS FOR DOCTORS, HOSPITALS AND LABORATORIES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
156 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
- Suffolk
Governance
- 04 May 2020: CIO registration
- 31 October 2020: Funds received from 1148000 SERV SUFFOLK & CAMBRIDGESHIRE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CINDY KAREN DICKERSON | Chair | 28 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Marie Foyster | Trustee | 13 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Frances Virginia Larke | Trustee | 31 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Smith | Trustee | 12 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Forman | Trustee | 12 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Louise Clough | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kristina Stefanie Nightingale | Trustee | 11 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Michael Laurence Thurman | Trustee | 28 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Hylton | Trustee | 28 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Albert Millard | Trustee | 28 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Stanger | Trustee | 28 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Maria Jane Cook | Trustee | 28 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £96.91k | £50.47k | £88.58k | £104.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.15k | £50.92k | £63.96k | £64.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £16.81k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 04 May 2020
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A TRANSPORTATION SERVICE TO TRANSPORT BLOOD, VACCINES, HUMAN MILK, SAMPLES AND OTHER ITEMS USED FOR THE MEDICAL OR SURGICAL TREATMENT OF PATIENTS FOR DOCTORS, HOSPITALS AND LABORATORIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHILTERN
3
FUNTHAMS LANE
WHITTLESEY
PETERBOROUGH
- Phone:
- 07766077746
- Email:
- info@servsc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window