Accounts and annual returns POWER OF PRAYER IN THE HOUSE OF PRAYER MINISTRY

Charity Number: 1191088
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2025 22 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2025 22 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2024 15 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 15 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 August 2024 211 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 29 August 2024 211 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 March 2023 31 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 03 March 2023 31 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 March 2023 395 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 02 March 2023 395 days late Download Open in new window