LEEDS AFRICAN COMMUNITIES CHARITABLE TRUST (LAC TRUST)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Leeds African Communites Trust promotes the wellbeing of people of African descent throughout Leeds, by advancing education, relieving poverty and improving their welfare, through community based activities in partnership with its associated African community groups, Leeds City Council and other public and private sector bodies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £38,823 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Leeds City
Governance
- 19 October 2020: CIO registration
- LAC (Working name)
- LEEDS AFRICAN COMMUNITIESTRUST (Previous name)
- THE LEEDS AFRICAN COMMUNITIES TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AISSATA TOURE | Trustee | 07 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kaddy Jabang | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Victoria Ebun Ajayi | Trustee | 13 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
ABDUL RASHID THOMAS | Trustee | 13 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Yankuba Sawo | Trustee | 13 March 2020 |
|
|||||
DAVID SALAHDU | Trustee | 13 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
LUCY NDLOVU | Trustee | 13 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.71k | £61.78k | £77.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.73k | £31.33k | £61.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.30k | £28.05k | £38.82k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 19 Oct 2020 as amended on 17 May 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING INFORMATION, ADVICE, AND GUIDANCE FOR PEOPLE OF AFRICAN ORIGIN OR DESCENT IN LEEDS. (2) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR PEOPLE OF AFRICAN ORIGIN OR DESCENT IN POVERTY OR NEED DUE TO THEIR ECONOMIC AND SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES IN LEEDS BY PROVIDING FOOD ITEMS, CLOTHING AND TOILETRIES, AS WELL AS ADVICE AND GUIDANCE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN COLLABORATION WITH OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LITTLE LONDON COMMUNITY CENTRE
OATLAND LANE
LEEDS
LS7 1SR
- Phone:
- +447738930081
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window