NISAI EDUCATION TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Nisai Education Trust carries out proofs of concept and action research into effective models of online education that meet the needs of the most vulnerable learners. It also develops professional understanding of the organisation and leadership of online education, and the understanding of pedagogy and the curriculum for online and blended education for vulnerable learners.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Bangladesh
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- South Africa
- United States
- Vietnam
Governance
- 23 July 2021: Standard registration
- NISAI EDUCATION TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Nishi Patel | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ahmadul Hoq | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr James Neil Pugh | Trustee | 09 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
DENISE ANNE YATES | Trustee | 09 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Joseph Michael McCann | Trustee | 09 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Hamilton Keenleyside | Trustee | 10 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dhruvakumar Prafull Patel | Trustee | 20 December 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.12k | £45.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.92k | £44.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 DEC 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 MAY 2020 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15 JUN 2020 as amended on 27 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('OBJECTS') ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: - TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL (AND PARTICULARLY AMONGST TEACHERS AND EDUCATIONALISTS) ON THE SUBJECT OF 'ONLINE' EDUCATION AND TO PROMOTE RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ALL ASPECTS OF THAT SUBJECT AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Floor 4
28 Clarendon Road
Watford
WD17 1JJ
- Phone:
- 02084248475
- Email:
- netinfo@nisai.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window