KIRK ELLA CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Charitable assistance for educational needs for university students & school children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 09 September 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 09 January 1985: Standard registration
- 09 March 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 09/09/2004 | 09/09/2005 | 09/09/2007 | 09/09/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.28k | £1.17k | £209 | £310 | |
|
Total expenditure | £400 | £600 | £500 | £400 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 09 September 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 09 September 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 09 September 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 09 September 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 09 September 2008 | 24 September 2009 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 September 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 09 September 2007 | 12 March 2009 | 246 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 September 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 09 September 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 09 September 2006 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 10 SEPTEMBER 1984.
Charitable objects
PROMOTING THE EDUCATION, INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING AND RELIGIOUS EDUCATION IN THE DOCTRINES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND, OF PERSONS WHO ARE OR WHO HAVE A PARENT RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF KIRK ELLA AND WHO IN THE TRUSTEES OPINION ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
THE ANCIENT PARISH OF KIRK ELLA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window