PARADIGM PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a youth empowerment specialist based in Lewisham, South London. Our work aims to tackle social inequality and its effects on young people and their later life outcomes. Our focus is on identifying risk and vulnerability at the earliest possible stage. We deliver programmes in schools, provide a mentoring service and training for staff and professionals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
Governance
- 09 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Aisha Sanusi | Chair | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Judith Topley | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Kippax | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Geer | Trustee | 28 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Zainab Asunramu | Trustee | 28 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Niquita Pilgrim | Trustee | 28 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Justin Nicholas Adair O'Neill | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joel Raymond Dawes | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.09k | £171.21k | £61.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.11k | £175.01k | £61.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 09 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF MENTORING, SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stephen Lawrence Centre
39 Brookmill Road
London
SE8 4HU
- Phone:
- 07395777566
- Email:
- joel@paradigmproject.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window