HANNAH LEVY HOUSE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grant giving
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Bournemouth
- Dorset
- Hampshire
- Poole
Governance
- 18 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN FELD | Chair | 18 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Joanna Solomons | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lise Rossano | Trustee | 18 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Lawrence Williams | Trustee | 18 September 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £500.00k | £60.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £720 | £30.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 14 April 2025 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 14 April 2025 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 21 March 2025 | 355 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 21 March 2025 | 355 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 04 May 2022 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 04 May 2022 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE JEWISH AND OTHER ELDERLY PEOPLE RESIDENT IN BOURNEMOUTH AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS WHO ARE IN NEED, BY PROVIDING A RESIDENTIAL CARE HOME AND SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PERSONS. TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SICKNESS AND POOR HEALTH AMONGST JEWISH ELDERLY PEOPLE IN BOURNEMOUTH AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS. ADVANCING ANY OTHER PURPOSE WHICH MAY BE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Solomons Solicitors
1-3 Alum Chine Road
BOURNEMOUTH
BH4 8DT
- Phone:
- 01202802807
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window