Accounts and annual returns COMMUNITIES FOR CHANGE

Charity number: 1193887
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2023 12 May 2024 102 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 14 May 2024 104 days late
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 07 February 2023 7 days late