BURRADON AND CAMPERDOWN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote for the benefit of the inhabitants of Burradon and Camperdown and the surrounding area the provision of facilities for recreation or other leisure time occupation of individuals who have need of such facilities by reason of their youth, age, infirmity or disablement, financial hardship or social and economic circumstances or for the public at large in the interests of social welfare and
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 26 June 2024
Total income includes £1,952 from 2 government grant(s)
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- North Tyneside
Governance
- 05 October 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Irene Gilbert | Chair | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Frances Kane | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Jobson Lowes | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Lambton | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
IRENE COATES | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marlene Redpath | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Chambers | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
michael Brittlebank | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
ALAN JAMES | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Donna Glennie | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marion Toye | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARY JAMES | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Wray | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Wray | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 26/06/2021 | 26/06/2022 | 26/06/2023 | 26/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £7.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £5.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.95k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 26 June 2024 | 28 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 June 2024 | 28 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 26 June 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 June 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 26 June 2022 | 16 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 June 2022 | 16 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 26 June 2021 | 18 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 June 2021 | 18 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BURRADON AND CAMPERDOWN AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 REDFORD PLACE
BURRADON
CRAMLINGTON
NE23 7LG
- Phone:
- 01912688729
- Email:
- cxwray@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window