FRIENDS OF CCHT FEDERATION

Charity Number: 1195212
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Charity objective is to advance the education of the pupils at Christ Church & Holy Trinity Primary schools by providing and assisting in the provision of facilities and resources for education at the federated schools.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £239,612
Total expenditure: £206,489

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Kensington And Chelsea

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 July 2021: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Peter Greetham Chair 07 July 2021
None on record
REV'D Brian LEATHARD Trustee 07 July 2021
CHELSEA NON-ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
MCCABE EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE CHURCH OF CEYLON ASSOCIATION
Charity reporting is overdue by 935 days
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST LUKE AND CHRIST CHURCH, CHELSEA
Received: On time
Quentin Garrett Nason Trustee 07 July 2021
CITY PAY IT FORWARD
Received: On time
Avis Mary Hawkins Trustee 07 July 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £95.20k £210.45k £239.61k
Total expenditure £141.26k £186.32k £206.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 16 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 27 March 2024 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 27 March 2024 56 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 18 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
CHRIST CHURCH C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL
1 ROBINSON STREET
LONDON
SW3 4AA
Phone:
02073525708