Accounts and annual returns CHRIST VICTORY CHRISTIAN CENTRE

Charity number: 1191543
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 03 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 03 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 27 April 2024 87 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 27 April 2024 87 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 06 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

09 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window