REENERGISING HUMAN POTENTIAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education/training
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- India
Governance
- 29 July 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Radhakrishnan VENKATASAMY | Trustee | 05 February 2023 |
|
|||||
ALAGARSAMY VENKATASAMY | Trustee | 05 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr VASANTH NAIDU | Trustee | 04 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Seenivasan Naidu | Trustee | 29 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 8 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 8 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 21 June 2024 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 21 June 2024 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 24 June 2023 | 55 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 10 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 10 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
1.TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE IN UK AND INDIAN VILLAGES IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF: (A)PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION. (B)SUPPORTING VILLAGE SCHOOLS AND TRAINING CENTRES THAT ARE RUN BY CHARITIES IN TAMIL NADU, INDIA. (C)SUPPLEMENTARY EDUCATION AND TRAINING RESOURCE DEVELOPMENT GRANTS TO CHARITIES THAT PROVIDE BENEFIT TO THE CHILDREN IN TAMIL NADU, INDIA. (D)AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION. (E)THE CONTINUED DEVELOPMENT OF THE CHILDREN’S CAPABILITIES, COMPETENCIES, SKILLS AND UNDERSTANDING IN THE SUBJECTS OF EDUCATIONAL VALUE. (F)EDUCATIONAL TRAINING AND TUTORIALS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL, MORAL AND CULTURAL CAPACITIES TO ACHIEVE THEIR FULL POTENTIAL SO THAT THEY MAY GROW UP TO FULL MATURITY AS RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF THEIR COMMUNITY AND SOCIETY. (G)PROVIDING ON-LINE FREE TUITION TO CHILDREN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
96 Longwood Gardens
Clayhall
ILFORD
IG5 0BB
- Phone:
- 07306393805
- Email:
- seenivasannaidu@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window