CHICHESTER LIONS CLUB (CIO)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity receives donations from fundraising activities carried out by volunteers. Funds raised are applied in support of individuals and charities in the local community and projects of Lions International. The charity undertakes work in the field of sight conservation, recycling spectacles for use in developing countries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- West Sussex
Governance
- 27 May 2020: CIO registration
- 29 March 2021: Funds received from 1057110 CHICHESTER LIONS CLUB CHARITABLE TRUST FUND
- CHICHESTER LIONS CLUB (Working name)
- LIONS CLUB OF CHICHESTER (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vincent Tony Foote | Chair | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Edwards | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Moore | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Christopher Wilson | Trustee | 27 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Corina June Hall | Trustee | 27 May 2020 |
|
|||||
ANTHONY WILLIAM HARRISON | Trustee | 27 May 2020 |
|
|||||
Linda Squires | Trustee | 27 May 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.97k | £50.63k | £47.61k | £45.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.62k | £48.49k | £47.21k | £60.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 10 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 10 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 22 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 22 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 27 May 2020
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CLUB ARE SUCH PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE IN ENGLAND & WALES, INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR: 3.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF CITIZENSHIP BY: 3.1.1.1 PROMOTING THE PRINCIPLES OF GOOD CITIZENSHIP; 3.1.1.2 ENCOURAGING MEMBERS TO TAKE AN ACTIVE INTEREST IN THE CIVIC, CULTURAL, SOCIAL AND MORAL WELFARE OF THE COMMUNITY; 3.1.1.3 PROVIDING A FORUM FOR THE OPEN DISCUSSION OF ALL MATTERS OF PUBLIC INTEREST; PROVIDED THAT PARTISAN POLITICS AND SECTARIAN RELIGION SHALL NOT BE DEBATED BY MEMBERS; 3.1.1.4 ENCOURAGING SERVICE-MINDED PEOPLE TO SERVE THEIR COMMUNITY WITHOUT PERSONAL REWARD AND ENCOURAGING THE PROMOTION OF HIGH ETHICAL STANDARDS IN COMMERCE, INDUSTRY, PROFESSIONS, PUBLIC WORKS AND PRIVATE ENDEAVOURS; 3.1.1.5 SUPPORTING YOUTH TO DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; 3.1.2 PROMOTING THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY ASSOCIATING WITH LOCAL AUTHORITIES IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF PEOPLE IN LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES; 3.1.3 PROMOTING VOLUNTEERING; 3.1.4 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING HUMANITARIAN AID AND DISASTER RELIEF; 3.1.5 THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR THE SAVING OF LIVES BY PREVENTING AVOIDABLE BLINDNESS, ASSISTING DISABLED PEOPLE TO LEAD INDEPENDENT LIVES OR HELPING TO PREVENT OR MANAGE HEALTH ISSUES; 3.1.6 PROMOTING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT; AND/OR 3.1.7 PROMOTING COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
101 Chatsworth Road
CHICHESTER
West Sussex
PO19 7YJ
- Phone:
- 03449632443
- Email:
- lions@chilions.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window