Financial history THORNTON GRAMMAR SCHOOL TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 516013
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011
Total gross income £2.01k £2.19k £2.04k £1.82k £1.78k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A