CARLTON-BOLLING COLLEGE TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Carlton-Bolling College educates young people in academic and vocational subjects and also promotes social well being and awareness. Many students initiate and take part in fund raising activites to benefit the more needed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bradford City
Governance
- 18 January 1985: Standard registration
- CARLTON BOLLING COLLEGE CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
- CARLTON-BOLLING COLLEGE FUND (Working name)
- CARLTON BOLLING UPPER SCHOOL TRUST FUND (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adrian Kneeshaw | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
ELEANOR JANE GIRT | Trustee | 01 June 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 March 2022 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 JULY 1984 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 24 FEBRUARY 1993.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS OF CARLTON BOLLING COLLEGE IN THE METROPOLTAN DISTRICT OF BRADFORD BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT CARLTON BOLLING COLLEGE (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Carlton Bolling College
Undercliffe Lane
Bradford
BD3 0DU
- Phone:
- 01274633111
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window