DEAN HALL WEST EALING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing the Christian faith for the public benefit in accordance with the its statement of beliefs in Ealing, London and in such other parts of the United Kingdom or the world as the charity trustees may from time to time think fit, particularly by providing facilities for Evangelical Christian worship in and around the Green Man Estate area of Ealing, London.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Ealing
Governance
- 29 April 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILLIP JASPER HERBERT | Chair | 29 April 2020 |
|
|||||||
DAVID CHARLES SMITH | Trustee | 29 April 2020 |
|
|||||||
Rev ANDREW PAUL LEVY | Trustee | 29 April 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.13k | £5.44k | £3.38k | £4.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.88k | £1.91k | £3.03k | £3.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2024 | 362 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2024 | 362 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 July 2022 | 250 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 July 2022 | 250 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Apr 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN EALING, LONDON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT, PARTICULARLY BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR EVANGELICAL CHRISTIAN WORSHIP IN AND AROUND THE GREEN MAN ESTATE AREA OF EALING, LONDON, AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITY WORK OF THE CHARITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
DEAN HALL CHRISTIAN ASSEMBLY
WILLIAMS ROAD
LONDON
W13 0RU
- Phone:
- 02089974706
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window