FANTASIA ORCHESTRA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Musical performances and educational activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 September 2020: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr James Hobson | Trustee | 27 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Susan Guy | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Tegan Eldridge | Trustee | 17 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Alexander Kerr | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Charles R Wolcott J.D. | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julian Roger Monier Hardwick | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.40k | £63.86k | £76.75k | £133.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.06k | £59.15k | £68.73k | £132.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ART OF MUSIC, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH: (1) AUDIENCE ENGAGEMENT WITH CLASSICAL AND/OR CONTEMPORARY COMPOSITIONS; AND/OR (2) BROADENING THE REACH AND ACCESSIBILITY OF MUSIC IN THE UK, PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, TO YOUNG PEOPLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
115 BRONDESBURY ROAD
LONDON
NW6 6RY
- Phone:
- 07884374397
- Email:
- info@fantasiaorchestra.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window